LANGNEY VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1152969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 12 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 December 2016 On time Download