PUDSEY WELLBEING CHARITY

Charity number: 1153331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Noreen Finister Trustee 11 October 2016 None on record
Isabel Vickers Trustee 19 April 2018 None on record
Rev Richard James Dimery Chair 07 February 2019 None on record
PATRICIA TRENAMAN Trustee 25 July 2017
LYNN WOOD APPEAL FUND Received: On time
HOME-START BRADFORD DISTRICT Received: On time
GEOFFREY JOSEPH THORNE Trustee 08 May 2013 None on record
Dr KATE MARY HILL PhDMScBSc Trustee 04 February 2014 None on record
Jill Huggins Trustee 15 January 2021 None on record
Carolyn Weaver Trustee 23 October 2017 None on record
Cllr Trish Smith Trustee 21 November 2019 None on record
Eleanor Scougall Trustee 09 August 2018 None on record