Accounts and annual returns BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE TALMUDIC ENCYCLOPAEDIA

Charity number: 1153949
Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 16 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 16 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 09 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 09 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required