Financial history BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE TALMUDIC ENCYCLOPAEDIA

Charity number: 1153949
Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £300.67k £20.91k £1.80k £48.12k £104.11k
Total expenditure £147.68k £167.65k £0 £52.05k £106.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A