Financial history CROYDON AFRICAN CARIBBEAN FAMILY ORGANISATION UK

Charity number: 1153669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £289.84k £268.48k £240.11k £296.11k £129.13k
Total expenditure £228.27k £266.95k £260.74k £302.90k £170.87k
Income from government contracts £129.48k £117.00k £118.00k £120.00k £26.67k
Income from government grants £69.92k £15.15k £15.00k £30.00k £44.03k