TAS VALLEY CELL CHURCH

Charity number: 1152589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 September 2017 On time Download