TAS VALLEY CELL CHURCH

Charity number: 1152589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Teresa Susan Stevens Trustee 20 October 2015 None on record
Angela Merchant Trustee 12 October 2018 None on record
Rev Coryn Hazel Stanforth Trustee 27 June 2020 None on record
William Spencer Ball Trustee 17 May 2013
NEWTON FLOTMAN VILLAGE CENTRE AND ALAN KING PLAYING FIELD Overdue by 29 days
Jane Patricia Garrec Trustee 11 May 2019 None on record
Rev Austin Chuks Uzoigwe Trustee 19 January 2019 None on record
Rev Dawn Margaret Davidson Chair 22 April 2015
SAXLINGHAM NETHERGATE CHURCH LANDS Received: On time
JOHN TUTHILL Received: On time