Accounts and annual returns YORK GYMNASTICS

Charity number: 1152516
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 June 2017 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 07 March 2016 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 15 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required