Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ELLOUGHTON-CUM-BROUGH
Charity number: 1152447

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rebecca Jane Allright | Chair | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian May Bullock | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Robinson | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Louise Miller | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Reynolds | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joann Randerson | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Towns | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Ogden | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Hayton | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Greaves | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hartley Mitchell | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET DUNCUM | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANE ELIZABETH MOFFATT | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.