EHSAN HEALTH ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1153294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £980 £1.08k £1.25k £1.40k £4.65k
Total expenditure £795 £850 £1.00k £1.30k £4.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A