Financial history A CLASS TUTORS

Charity number: 1153462
Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £40.37k £54.98k £90.77k £101.28k £33.71k
Total expenditure £39.07k £56.28k £90.40k £101.55k £33.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.24k N/A N/A N/A N/A