Financial history NEWARK COMMUNITY FIRST AID

Charity number: 1152694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £56.42k £64.97k £68.47k £72.02k £43.80k
Total expenditure £34.26k £80.02k £42.33k £109.17k £33.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £2.20k