Financial history BOOKS TO AFRICA INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1152599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £266.96k £421.97k £322.61k £298.25k £336.56k
Total expenditure £281.44k £445.51k £386.84k £313.54k £314.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A