ST STEPHEN'S WESTMINSTER BELLS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian religion by providing funding to re-hang the bells of St Stephen's church, Rochester Row, Westminster, London SW1P 1JJ, and to carry out all the necessary ancillary work to make this possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 03 June 2013: Standard registration
- SSWBF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DICKON LOVE | Chair | 31 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ESTHER ELIZABETH COOKE SZEWCZYK MA PGCE | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE WALSH | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP GOODYER | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD BARKER | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES BELSHAW | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £422 | £180 | £240 | £539 | £1.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92 | £58 | £19 | £397 | £4 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 MAR 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PROVIDING FUNDING TO RE-HANG THE BELLS OF ST STEPHEN'S, AND TO CARRY OUT ALL THE NECESSARY ANCILLARY WORK TO MAKE THIS POSSIBLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
Willow Court
29 Willow Place
London
SW1P 1JJ
- Phone:
- 02076305496
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window