THE WILTSHIRE BOBBY VAN TRUST

Charity number: 1153790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 September 2017 On time Download