Financial history THE WILTSHIRE BOBBY VAN TRUST

Charity number: 1153790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £162.11k £237.78k £159.17k £248.42k £230.24k
Total expenditure £209.94k £253.21k £276.75k £257.58k £288.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.59k £1.12k £1.66k £810 £17.32k