THE WILTSHIRE BOBBY VAN TRUST

Charity number: 1153790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MAJOR MARK JAMES ALEXANDER CANN Trustee 24 July 2013
FRIENDS OF POLOAFRICA DEVELOPMENT TRUST Received: On time
Emily Tulloch Trustee 21 October 2019 None on record
ROBERT RALPH SCRYMGEOUR HISCOX Chair 24 July 2013
THE KENNETH ARMITAGE FOUNDATION Received: 2 days late
THE PAOLOZZI FOUNDATION Received: On time
COLONEL ROBERT FREDRICK RICHARDSON-AITKEN Trustee 24 July 2013 None on record
Marion Elizabeth Deegan Trustee 10 December 2019 None on record
JOHN NOKES Trustee 24 July 2013 None on record
Lucinda Baker Trustee 16 March 2020 None on record
Chief Constable Kier Martin Pritchard Trustee 15 May 2018 None on record