Financial history THE HUGE PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1153640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £30.90k £22.08k £43.37k £36.05k £41.36k
Total expenditure £26.55k £18.79k £21.22k £20.64k £41.36k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A