Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN ELLAND

Charity number: 1152415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 November 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window