SAFFRON HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1153685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR BARRY WILLIAM IFE Chair 14 September 2017
THE CITY ARTS TRUST LIMITED Overdue by 596 days
HUGH ROBERT PARNELL Trustee 14 September 2017
MAGPAS Received: On time
MARK HAYES Trustee 14 June 2013
CHRISTIAN ACTION HOUSING ASSOCIATION TRUST Received: On time
WESTMINSTER COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE Received: On time
SAFFRON WALDEN COUNTY HIGH SCHOOL Received: 36 days late
Dominic Wallis Mr Trustee 25 June 2019
UPPINGHAM SCHOOL Received: On time
JOHN STUART LODGE Trustee 09 October 2018 None on record
Pam Davis Trustee 09 October 2018 None on record
Polly Lankester Trustee 14 September 2017 None on record
David Barrs Trustee 17 May 2013
THE ANN DODGSON FOUNDATION Received: On time
YELLOW CAR CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Caroline Derbyshire Trustee 04 January 2016
SAFFRON WALDEN COUNTY HIGH SCHOOL Received: 36 days late
Nick Finlayson-Brown Trustee 14 January 2020 None on record