REED FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1154027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £5.65m £13.61k £5.31k £3.59k £4.17k
Total expenditure £1.02m £103.61k £4.07m £68.06k £54.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.63m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £21.58k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.01m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.75k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £995.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £6.49k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A