GIVE A CHILD A HOPE

Charity number: 1153184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £109.23k £108.84k £118.92k £126.60k £99.13k
Total expenditure £102.22k £83.93k £148.49k £122.76k £100.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A