BELIEVE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1154141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.44k £3.92k £3.39k £10.81k £2.58k
Total expenditure £5.53k £0 £1.50k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A