THE BERKELEY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1152596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £1.76m £2.72m £1.67m £3.41m £4.75m
Total expenditure £1.82m £3.00m £1.70m £3.56m £3.41m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.75m £2.72m £1.66m £3.40m £4.73m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.05k £7.30k £9.23k £10.72k £19.50k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.82m £3.00m £1.70m £3.56m £3.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.45k £8.45k £8.45k £8.45k £8.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.03m £2.39m £1.23m £0 £2.94m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.18k £88 £66 £174 £305