DA ROCHA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Foundation is to provide disadvantaged children with a better quality of life. Be it through clothes, reading materials, classroom equipment or however the Foundation sees fit. At present much of the work is conducted in Ghana, supporting 4 orphanages, but the Foundation also makes regular donations to The Trussell Trust to mirror the work conducted in Ghana.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ghana
Governance
- 10 September 2013: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REX DA ROCHA | Chair | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOSIE DEGNAN | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROWENA DA ROCHA | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAUD DA ROCHA | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
LAURA AIKMAN | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
RYAN DA ROCHA | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £708 | £80 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.38k | £866 | £708 | £100 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 April 2022 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED ON 18/08/2013
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN GHANA AND THE UK, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF ORPHANAGES IN GHANA AND FOOD BANKS IN THE UK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Wychwood Way
Northwood
HA6 1EJ
- Phone:
- 07740451422
- Email:
- enq@darochafoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window