Financial history 5TH PENWORTHAM SCOUT GROUP (UNITED REFORMED CHURCH)

Charity number: 503845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £78.72k £74.68k £82.10k £50.65k £64.86k
Total expenditure £86.68k £82.73k £80.95k £33.38k £91.64k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A