ADAAP (ASIAN DOMESTIC ABUSE AWARENESS PROJECT)

Charity number: 1153256
Removed charity
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 FEB 2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1. THE RELIEF OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE MENTAL, AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF WOMEN, AND MEN YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE EXPOSED TO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO):- (I)HELPING FAMILIES RE-ESTABLISH SAFETY, BUILD THEIR SELF-ESTEEM, WORK THROUGH GRIEF AND TRAUMA AND HELP THEM ACCESS SUPPORT FOR THEIR CHILDREN BY PROVIDING FAMILIES WITH LINKS TO VARIOUS SUPPORT AGENCIES. (II) PROVIDING ONE TO ONE AND GROUP COUNSELLING AND PHONE AND WEB SUPPORT. 2. TO RAISE AWARENESS AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON THE PSYCHOLOGICAL IMPACT OF DOMESTIC ABUSE AND HONOUR BASED VIOLENCE ON A) INDIVIDUALS AND B) THE WIDER IMPACT ON SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION IN PARTICULAR OF (BUT NOT LIMITED TO):- SEMINARS, WORKSHOPS AND DISCUSSIONS TO:- (I) TACKLE- 'WHY CHANGE MINDSETS OVER DOMESTIC ABUSE' AND DEVELOPING A PROGRAM OF 'CHANGING ATTITUDES' WITHIN THE COMMUNITY. (II) HELP THE COMMUNITY TO BECOME MORE FAMILIAR AND DEFINE THE VARIOUS STRANDS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE. (III) ILLUSTRATE THROUGH VARIOUS SCRIPTURES AND DOCTRINES WITHIN ALL LEADING FAITHS WHICH DENOUNCE DOMESTIC ABUSE. (IV) TACKLE AND RAISE THE AWARENESS OF 'HONOUR BASED VIOLENCE' WITHIN THE ASIAN COMMUNITY AND EDUCATE ON THE DETRIMENTAL IMPACT IT HAS ON FAMILIES. (V) TACKLE THE ASIAN PHENOMENON OF REVENGE AND THE USE OF DOMESTIC ABUSE AND USE OF CHILDREN TO 'HATE' OPPOSING PARENTS WHEN SEPARATION OCCURS AND THE IMPORTANCE OF BREAKING THE CYCLE OF ABUSE WHICH CONTINUES INTO THE NEXT GENERATION. (VI)HIGHLIGHTING THE NEGATIVE IMPACT OF DOMESTIC ABUSE AND ITS SOCIAL IMPACT ON INDIVIDUALS, THE VICTIMS, FAMILIES, COMMUNITIES AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY. IDENTIFYING UNDERLYING CAUSES OF DOMESTIC ABUSE. (VII) PROVIDING THROUGH ADAAP A PREVENTATIVE SOLUTION TO PROMOTE POSITIVE FAMILIES AND COMMUNITY.
Organisation type
Charitable company
Registration history
  • 06 August 2013 : registered
  • 09 August 2016 : removed (DOES NOT OPERATE)
  • 15 October 2016 : re-registered
  • 21 March 2017 : removed (DOES NOT OPERATE)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helped
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information