Accounts and annual returns ZION BAPTIST CHURCH LONDON

Charity number: 1153563
Charity reporting is overdue by 49 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 49 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 49 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 07 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 07 November 2022 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 November 2022 525 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 07 November 2022 525 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 05 February 2021 250 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 05 February 2021 250 days late Download Open in new window