Financial history ZION BAPTIST CHURCH LONDON

Charity number: 1153563
Charity reporting is overdue by 53 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £66.12k £40.22k £30.79k £3.32k £1.79k
Total expenditure £67.16k £45.32k £32.21k £350 £2.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A