ST. MONICA'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1152590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £89.12k £95.02k £115.93k £106.27k £72.06k
Total expenditure £86.56k £97.22k £98.54k £99.49k £65.38k
Income from government contracts £52.30k £56.78k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A