Financial history THE GREEN BACKYARD

Charity number: 1155534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £50.75k £30.14k £85.56k £72.60k £21.50k
Total expenditure £68.97k £51.96k £63.42k £78.50k £51.38k
Income from government contracts £17.98k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £350 N/A N/A N/A N/A