Trustees THE GREEN BACKYARD
Charity number: 1155534

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VANESSA POOL | Chair | 02 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Harriet O'Shea | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Blades | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Sainsbury | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Staton | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Staton | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Shaw | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Dixon | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Elizabeth Vince | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mahemuda Arsalani | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.