Financial history ELIFAR FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1152416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £99.64k £327.25k £176.96k £274.18k £149.35k
Total expenditure £173.19k £219.14k £263.72k £253.19k £165.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A