Accounts and annual returns UZIMA IN OUR HANDS

Charity number: 1153181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 June 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 03 June 2020 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 26 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 11 June 2018 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 June 2018 11 days late Download Open in new window