THE ROYAL VETERINARY COLLEGE STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1153002
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 June 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 21 June 2021 21 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 18 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 28 January 2020 242 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 20 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 22 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 20 February 2017 On time Download