Financial history THE ROYAL VETERINARY COLLEGE STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1153002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £842.00k £863.83k £981.24k £796.74k £557.12k
Total expenditure £840.75k £855.03k £966.64k £774.65k £507.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £368.48k £414.90k £0 £462.21k £430.28k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £462.12k £434.52k £968.29k £245.08k £120.59k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £11.39k £14.42k £12.95k £16.60k £6.25k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £840.75k £855.03k £966.64k £774.65k £507.72k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0