LEEDS & LIVERPOOL CANAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society promotes the Leeds & Liverpool Canal's history & environment, ensuring its traditions and heritage survive, with talks, informative walks and telling stories of the canal & boating families. The Society owns the Heritage Short Boat Kennet, maintained by volunteers, travelling the Canal's Corridor with a cargo of displays & hands on activities to communities, organisations and schools
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 March 2014: Standard registration
- L&LCS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FREDA CHILDS | Chair | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Linda Bailey | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Russ | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HUSTLER | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL MORLEY | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
LYNTON JOHN CHILDS | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
HAROLD BOND | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.46k | £6.51k | £4.60k | £6.48k | £5.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.60k | £9.02k | £2.74k | £2.40k | £12.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED ON 08/03/2014
Charitable objects
(A) TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND RESTORATION OF THE LEEDS & LIVERPOOL CANAL AND ITS WORKING BOATS. (B) TO ENCOURAGE A GREATER UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE CANAL'S HERITAGE AND ENVIRONMENT. (C) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT F THE GENERAL PUBLIC THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES OR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
76 Sefton Avenue
BRIGHOUSE
West Yorkshire
HD6 2NA
- Phone:
- 01282 850430
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window