COSBY UNITED YOUTH & JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Junior football club for all ages
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 24 October 2014: Standard registration
- COSBY UNITED YOUTH & JUNIOR FC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
richard woolerton | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Phillips | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.15k | £26.17k | £66.33k | £35.97k | £43.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.80k | £35.72k | £52.79k | £44.92k | £44.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 June 2024 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 12 June 2024 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2022
(These accounts |
04 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2021
(These accounts |
14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/08/2010 AS AMENDED ON 29/04/2014
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE AMATEUR SPORT OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL 2) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL (FACILITIES MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING FOOTBALL ACTIVITIES). 3) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 4) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHETHER OR NOT UNDERGOING FORMAL EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Severn Close
Cosby
LEICESTER
LE9 1UY
- Phone:
- 07809535454
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window