BOXER DOG RESCUE NORTHERN ENGLAND

Charity number: 1153127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £46.17k £48.03k £36.66k £34.78k £40.05k
Total expenditure £47.26k £35.52k £28.89k £28.10k £23.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A