RINGLESTONE COMMUNITY CENTRE DEVELOPMENT GROUP

Charity number: 1154020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £13.45k £1.06k £1.38k £22.95k £133.28k
Total expenditure £150 £1.15k £2.34k £19.51k £12.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £1.00k £58.94k