Accounts and annual returns BRIGHT SIGHT MISSION

Charity number: 1154486
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 September 2020 08 August 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 20 September 2019 13 August 2020 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 20 September 2018 02 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 20 September 2017 31 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 20 September 2016 01 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2016 Not Required