Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT JOHN-IN-BEDWARDINE, WORCESTER

Charity number: 1152583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 December 2019 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 December 2019 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 May 2017 On time Download Open in new window