Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT JOHN-IN-BEDWARDINE, WORCESTER

Charity number: 1152583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amy Rees Trustee 29 May 2018
None on record
Fiona Templeton Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
MARGARET ANN RUTTER Trustee 03 April 2016
None on record
BARBARA ANN WILLIS Trustee 03 April 2016
None on record
GRAHAM WILLIS Trustee 03 April 2016
None on record
Rev Sarah Louise Cottrill Trustee 29 June 2014
None on record
JOY JOB Trustee 06 April 2014
CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
CHRIS MICHAEL REES Trustee 06 April 2014
None on record
GRAHAM PATRICK EVANS Trustee 21 June 2013
CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
MR GORDON TEMPLETON Trustee 21 June 2013
CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
WORCESTER LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Received: On time
JANE ANTHEA ASKEW Trustee 21 June 2013
None on record
MRS SUE BALE Trustee 21 June 2013
None on record
COLIN LIONEL NASH Trustee 21 June 2013
None on record
LUISE HORROCKS Trustee 21 June 2013
None on record