ST NEOTS FOODBANK

Charity number: 1154018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Francis Leher Trustee 19 April 2021 None on record
Wendy Daphne Hallett Trustee 19 April 2021 None on record
Andrea Lees Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
Malcolm Crawford Trustee 11 July 2016 None on record
Barbara Spencer MB BS Trustee 24 April 2017
ST NEOTS AND HUNTINGDON METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT Received: On time
Dr ROGER PEPPIATT Trustee 11 July 2016 None on record
Dr DAVID PACINI Chair 07 October 2019 None on record
Carol Way Trustee 15 January 2018 None on record
Jennifer Henderson Trustee 02 October 2017 None on record