Financial history THE ROYAL AIR FORCE CENTRAL FUND

Charity number: 1152560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.39m £4.66m £4.12m £5.14m £4.17m
Total expenditure £5.65m £4.54m £4.85m £4.24m £4.63m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £99.60k £147.97k £66.77k £174.61k £179.51k
Income - Other trading activities £2.61m £2.83m £2.88m £3.80m £3.12m
Income - Charitable activities £264.26k £234.43k £170.97k £525.34k £98.89k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.38m £1.44m £871.25k £632.20k £741.23k
Income - Other £27.48k £11.83k £126.34k £1.00k £28.31k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.85m £2.74m £2.99m £2.37m £3.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.79m £1.80m £1.84m £1.87m £1.58m
Expenditure - Governance £150.49k £150.86k £14.11k £19.56k £551.81k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.75m £1.60m £1.88m £1.39m £2.15m
Expenditure - Investment management £178.03k £185.18k £242.76k £339.20k £293.43k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £13.33k £0 £0