Trustees NORTHANTS 4X4 RESPONSE

Charity number: 1153147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gordon Monteith Brown Chair 26 June 2014
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE EMERGENCY RESPONSE CORPS
Overdue by 477 days
James Robert Anthony Nicholson Trustee 21 June 2023
None on record
Gary Brian Taylor Trustee 21 June 2023
None on record
Richard Delroy Evans Trustee 23 February 2023
None on record
Samuel David Nelson Trustee 27 May 2021
None on record
Wayne Peter Fisher Trustee 06 April 2019
None on record
Mr Jon Fry Trustee 26 April 2018
None on record
Mr Mike Corfe Trustee 07 December 2017
None on record