Financial history THE SERSE TRUST

Charity number: 1153972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £49.64k £51.05k £47.77k £49.79k £12.88k
Total expenditure £52.86k £39.92k £40.90k £48.23k £17.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A