Accounts and annual returns THE WAVE LONDON MISSION

Charity number: 1156349
Charity reporting is overdue by 165 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 165 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 165 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window