Financial history THE WAVE LONDON MISSION

Charity number: 1156349
Charity reporting is overdue by 168 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £234.64k £261.17k £281.96k £227.54k £203.35k
Total expenditure £218.10k £249.25k £303.07k £289.49k £298.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £29.64k N/A