Accounts and annual returns OXFORDSHIRE OESOPHAGEAL AND STOMACH ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1152733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 July 2020 167 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 August 2019 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 June 2018 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window